Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Benzoni, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sora, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1601³Born
20 Sep 163231.6AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
10 Oct 163231.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
1637¹35.9DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Benzoni
Bishop Paolo Benzoni C.R.L. (born , died 1637) Bishop of Sora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 32
  • ob/c2: AT, 3 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,997

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast