Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Angelo Bellingeri

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Pavia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tamasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1703Born
21 Sep 172622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
5 Apr 175652.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pavia, Italy
5 Apr 175652.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
30 Nov 175653.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
5 Dec 177370.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Angelo Bellingeri
Bishop Pio Angelo Bellingeri (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassignana, Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia)
Death PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Buried Place (Original)Capuchin Nuns of Santa Franca, Church, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 391, and Page 451
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,046
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 28
  • d: AT, 11 Dec 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: AT, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017