Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tobias Ján Becker

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1649Born
18 Mar 167323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
24 Nov 170152.3SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
3 Apr 170252.7ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
14 May 170252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
11 Sep 171061.1DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Tobias Ján Becker
Bishop Tobias Ján Becker (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKráliky

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,923
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast