Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Angelico (Antonius Maria Alexander) Becchetti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1742Born
22 Feb 176624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Aug 180058.5AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
17 Aug 180058.6Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
8 Jul 181472.4ResignedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
27 Aug 181472.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Angelico (Antonius Maria Alexander) Becchetti
Bishop Filippo Angelico (Antonius Maria Alexander) Becchetti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast