Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Barisani, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1739BornNapoli
5 Dec 176222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
31 Oct 179757.8SelectedBishop of Gerace, Italy
18 Dec 179758.0ConfirmedBishop of Gerace, Italy
21 Dec 179758.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
4 Feb 180666.1DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Barisani
Bishop Vincenzo Barisani O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016