Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino D’Avolio, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1758Born
Dec 177416.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Nov 178224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Dec 181961.2SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
21 Feb 182061.3ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
27 Feb 182061.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Jul 182061.7InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Jul 182162.7DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino D’Avolio
Bishop Bernardino D’Avolio O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIschitella

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1820, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018