Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Asteo, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
17 Nov 160846.9AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
23 Nov 160846.9Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
15 Aug 162664.6DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Asteo:
Bishop Girolamo Asteo O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Veroli

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 365
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 45, Number 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013