Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Arigoni, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1570BornGalbiate
3 Apr 163463.3AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Apr 1634³63.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
6 Mar 163665.2DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Arigoni
Bishop Antonio Arigoni O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 28
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Sep 2016