Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Armellini

Deceased

Bishop of Terni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1769BornRoma
16 Mar 179323.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 182253.4AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
12 Jan 182353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
17 Dec 182859.4DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Armellini
Bishop Domenico Armellini (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1823, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016