Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio Angelini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1636BornSan Constance
20 Nov 169761.5AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
24 Nov 169761.6Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
9 Dec 171074.6ResignedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Angelini:
Bishop Ambrosio Angelini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Acquapendente

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015