Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Alberici

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1685BornNocera
8 Apr 171934.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 173247.1AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
14 Apr 173247.2Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
27 Jun 173550.4AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
6 Oct 174156.6DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Alberici:
Bishop Francesco Maria Alberici (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a priest for 22.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1741
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1732, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015