Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifacio Agliardi (Alliardi), C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹Born
2 Aug 165543.5AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
8 Aug 165543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
1 Feb 166654.0DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Agliardi (Alliardi)
Bishop Bonifacio Agliardi (Alliardi) C.R. (born 1612, died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018