Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Deodati, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1629³BornCastellane
2 Jun 164717.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 169767.7AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
7 Jul 169767.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
7 Aug 171383.8DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Deodati:
Archbishop Andrea Deodati O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015