Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolpho Acquaviva

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornNapoli, Italy
12 Mar 166834.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
3 Apr 166834.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
15 Apr 166834.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Aug 1670³36.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
12 May 167238.3DiedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodolpho Acquaviva
Bishop Rodolpho Acquaviva (born 1634, died ) Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 5
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016