Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Charles Wismick, S.M.M.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

Titular Bishop of Lestrona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1963 Born
8 Sep 199026.7First VowsMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
15 Jan 199531.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
31 May 202460.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
31 May 202460.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lestrona
3 Aug 202460.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lestrona

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles Wismick
(WikiData: Q126209767)
Father Jean-Charles Wismick S.M.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetites-Desdunes, Diocese of Les Gonaïves
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Church, Pétion-Ville

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2024
  • ob: CB, 8 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 8 Jul 2024