Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fontanier Cardinal de Vassal, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Grado, Italy

Administrator of Ravenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1295¹Born
11 Jun 134348.4AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
24 Oct 134752.8AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
1348¹53.0ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
20 May 1351³56.3AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
20 May 1351³56.3AppointedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
17 Sep 136166.7Elevated to Cardinal
16 Oct 136166.7DiedPatriarch of Grado, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fontanier de Vassal
Fontanier Cardinal de Vassal O.F.M. (born 1295, died ) Patriarch of Grado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaillac, Diocese of Cahors, France
Death PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Buried Place (Original)S. Antonio, Church, Padua, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a cardinal for .0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 415, and Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jun 2021

Quantcast