Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arkadiusz Trochanowski

Bishop of Olsztyn-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1973 Born
19 Aug 199825.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
29 Jul 200027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
25 Nov 202047.8AppointedBishop of Olsztyn-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
23 Jan 202148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Olsztyn-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Arkadiusz Trochanowski
Bishop Arkadiusz Trochanowski (born ) Bishop of Olsztyn-Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzprotawa
Ordained DeaconSzprotawa
Ordained PriestWrocław, Diocese of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian)
Ordained BishopHoly Protection, Cathedral, Olsztyn, Eparchy of Olsztyn-Gdańsk (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Olsztyn-Gdańsk (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 8 Dec 2020
  • c4: CB, 23 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 May 2021

Quantcast