Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Denis (Omer) Strittmatter, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (President/American-Cassinese Benedictine Congregation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1896Born
2 Jul 191720.8Simple VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 192023.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 192326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1953²56.3AppointedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
1965²68.3ResignedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Mar 197174.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis (Omer) Strittmatter
Abbot Denis (Omer) Strittmatter O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHastings, PA, USA
Death PlaceLatrobe, PA
Buried Place (Original)St. Vincent, Cemetery

  • a priest for 47.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast