Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ruggero di Stefanuzia

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jun 1273AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
1289¹AppointedAdministrator of Molfetta, Italy
7 Nov 1290ResignedAdministrator of Molfetta, Italy
15 Aug 1295AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
1298²DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ruggero di Stefanuzia
Archbishop Ruggero di Stefanuzia (died 1298) Archbishop of Cosenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 448, and Page 220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast