Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Petru Sescu

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Iaşi, Romania

Titular Bishop of Murcona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1965 Born
26 May 199126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Iaşi, Romania
30 Sep 202156.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Iaşi, Romania
30 Sep 202156.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Murcona
11 Nov 202156.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murcona

MicroData Summary for Petru Sescu
Father Petru Sescu (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Iaşi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSăbăoani
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSfânta Fecioară Maria, Regină, Cathedral, Iaşi, Diocese of Iaşi

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Iaşi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2021
  • c1: CB, 30 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Oct 2021

Quantcast