Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Joseph Secondo, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Minister General Emeritus of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1915Born
18 Sep 193924.1ProfessedMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
1946²30.4Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
3 Jun 196549.8AppointedMinister General of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
1977²61.4CeasedMinister General of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
16 Mar 200589.6DiedMinister General Emeritus of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph Secondo (VIAF: 88336257)
Father Louis Joseph Secondo T.O.R. (born , died ) Minister General Emeritus of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City, NJ, USA
Death PlaceHollidaysburg, PA, Diocese of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
Buried Place (Original)St. Bernardine Monastery, Cemetery, Hollidaysburg, PA, Diocese of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA

  • a priest for 59.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Oct 2015
  • mn/mige/bd/loc: CB, 8 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast