Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Michael Schmondiuk

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1912Born
29 Mar 193623.6Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
20 Jul 195643.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
20 Jul 195643.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
8 Nov 195644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
14 Aug 196149.0AppointedBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
20 Sep 197765.1AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
25 Dec 197866.3DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Michael Schmondiuk
Archbishop Joseph Michael Schmondiuk (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWall, PA

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 100
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Apr 2021

Quantcast