Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis-Jean Sander

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

Titular Bishop of Privata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1967 Born
17 Nov 199629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
31 May 202456.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
31 May 202456.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Privata
3 Aug 202456.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Privata

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jean Sander
(WikiData: Q126209705)
Father Louis-Jean Sander (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJérémie, Diocese of Les Cayes
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Church, Pétion-Ville

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2024
  • ob: CB, 8 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 8 Jul 2024