Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ramón Salazar Estrada

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Bisarcio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1963 Born
30 May 199330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Sep 202158.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Sep 202158.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisarcio
30 Nov 202158.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisarcio

MicroData Summary for Ramón Salazar Estrada
Father Ramón Salazar Estrada (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSantuario de los Mártires Mexicanos, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Sep 2021

Quantcast