Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orlando Romero Cabrera

Bishop Emeritus of Canelones, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1933 Born
15 Dec 195723.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 198652.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
26 May 198652.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
13 Jul 198652.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
25 Oct 199460.8AppointedBishop of Canelones, Uruguay
23 Feb 201076.1RetiredBishop of Canelones, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Orlando Romero Cabrera
Bishop Orlando Romero Cabrera (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Canelones

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFagina
Ordained BishopN.S. del Carmen de la Aguada, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Canelones.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 99, Number 8,545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast