Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Helímenas de Jesús Rojo Paredes, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Calabozo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1926Born
8 Jul 195024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
24 Mar 198053.9AppointedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
18 May 198054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
17 Jun 199569.1AppointedArchbishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
27 Dec 200175.6RetiredArchbishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
9 Apr 202194.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Calabozo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Helímenas de Jesús Rojo Paredes
Archbishop Helímenas de Jesús Rojo Paredes C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Calabozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalderas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mérida, Archdiocese of Mérida
Death PlaceCalabozo, Archdiocese of Calabozo

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,693
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,020
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Apr 2021

Quantcast