Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmine Rocco

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Iustinianopolis in Galatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1912Born
26 Jul 193624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Calvi e Teano, Italy
5 Oct 196149.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iustinianopolis in Galatia
5 Oct 196149.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
12 Nov 196149.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iustinianopolis in Galatia
16 Sep 196755.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
22 May 197361.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
12 May 198270.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carmine Rocco (VIAF: 310550451)
Archbishop Carmine Rocco (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Brazil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamigliano

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 253, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 266, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 384, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 440, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 516, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 859, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,036, Ascendance
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Aug 2021

Quantcast