Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Pfefferhard

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1325AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
18 Sep 1329Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
23 May 1331DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johannes Pfefferhard
Bishop Johannes Pfefferhard (died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon
Death PlaceTüfelsruggen (prisoner), Château

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast