Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilberto Pastana de Oliveira

Archbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1956 Born
27 Jul 198528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santarém, Para, Brazil
3 Aug 200549.0AppointedBishop of Imperatriz, Maranhão, Brazil
28 Oct 200549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Imperatriz, Maranhão, Brazil
13 Nov 200549.2InstalledBishop of Imperatriz, Maranhão, Brazil
18 May 201659.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
17 Jul 201659.9InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
28 Dec 201660.4SucceededBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
2 Jun 202164.8AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
18 Jul 202164.9InstalledArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Pastana de Oliveira
Archbishop Gilberto Pastana de Oliveira (born ) Archbishop of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoim
Ordained BishopPlaza, Nossa Senhora da Conceição, Church, Santarém, Diocese of Santarém, Para

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,007
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 May 2016
  • i: CB, 18 May 2016
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 9 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast