Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cayetano Parra Novo, O.P.

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1950 Born
13 Oct 197424.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Oct 197929.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Nov 201666.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala
11 Nov 201666.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubia
21 Jan 201766.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubia
16 Jul 202170.8AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala
30 Sep 202171.0InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for José Cayetano Parra Novo (VIAF: 29432433)
Bishop José Cayetano Parra Novo O.P. (born ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOtívar, Archdiocese of Granada, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guatemala, Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa de Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,322
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2021
  • i: AM, 29 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast