Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Maria Pagani, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1835Born
1861¹25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Feb 188549.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mangalore, India
21 Feb 188549.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
25 Oct 188550.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
25 Nov 188651.2AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
30 Apr 189559.7DiedBishop of Mangalore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Maria Pagani
Bishop Nicolaus Maria Pagani S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera de’ Pagani, Diocese of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mangalore, Vicariate Apostolic of Mangalore

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363, and Page 565
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 58
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast