Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Nowicki

Deceased

Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1900Born
15 Mar 192423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
26 Apr 195150.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
26 Apr 195150.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriane
21 Sep 195454.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriane
1 Dec 195656.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thugga
7 Mar 196463.4AppointedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
10 Mar 197170.4DiedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edmund Nowicki
Bishop Edmund Nowicki (born , died ) Bishop of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrzemeszno
Ordained PriestChurch, Gniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1954
  • opd/c1: CB, 28 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast