Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edmund Cardinal Dalbor

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1869Born
25 Feb 189323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
30 Jun 191545.6AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
21 Sep 191545.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
15 Dec 191950.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 191950.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
13 Feb 192656.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edmund Dalbor
Edmund Cardinal Dalbor (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstrowo

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
  • a cardinal for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 58
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast