Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso de Moncada, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1710Born
17 Sep 174333.3SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
23 Sep 174333.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
1 Mar 174433.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
20 Sep 175141.3AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
Oct 1762³52.3DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso de Moncada
Archbishop Tommaso de Moncada O.P. (born , died Oct 1762) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopMessina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235, and Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 6
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Feb 2021

Quantcast