Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Michiaki Yamanouchi, S.D.B.

Bishop of Saitama, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1955 Born
24 Jan 198226.1Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Dec 198429.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Jun 201862.4AppointedBishop of Saitama, Japan
24 Sep 201862.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saitama, Japan

MicroData Summary for Mario Michiaki Yamanouchi
Bishop Mario Michiaki Yamanouchi S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Saitama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOita, Prefecture Apostolic of Miyazaki
Ordained PriestSan Juan, Argentina
Ordained BishopJubilee Hall, Urawa Akenohoshi Gakuen School, Saitama, Diocese of Saitama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saitama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 12 Jun 2018
  • c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,855
  • 12.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast