Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Martínez de Peralta, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹Born
7 Jun 162151.4AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
5 Sep 162151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
13 Jun 162252.4AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
29 Jan 162454.0AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
5 Oct 162959.7DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Martínez de Peralta
Archbishop Juan Martínez de Peralta O.S.H. (born 1570, died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMendigorria
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 140, Number 894
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 33
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,930
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,233
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast