Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio José López Castillo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1945Born
18 Jul 197025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Maracaibo, Venezuela
26 Feb 198842.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
26 Feb 198842.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Theuzi
28 May 198842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theuzi
1 Aug 199247.0AppointedBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
31 Oct 199247.3InstalledBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
27 Dec 200156.4AppointedArchbishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
22 Dec 200762.4AppointedArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
25 Mar 202074.7RetiredArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
18 Jul 202176.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio José López Castillo
Archbishop Antonio José López Castillo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Rafael de Mara
Ordained BishopMaracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Death PlaceMaracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,558
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2020
  • d: CB, 18 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast