Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antonio Lezcano y Ortega

Deceased

Archbishop of Managua, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1865Born
15 Apr 188823.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 191348.6AppointedArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
3 May 191449.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
6 Jan 195286.7DiedArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Lezcano y Ortega
Archbishop José Antonio Lezcano y Ortega (born , died ) Archbishop of Managua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada
Ordained PriestCathedral, León, Diocese of Nicaragua
Ordained BishopManagua, Archdiocese of Managua

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 17
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,757

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast