Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ján Chryzostom Cardinal Korec, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nitra, Slovakia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1924Born
1 Oct 195026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Aug 195127.5Ordained BishopBishop
6 Feb 199066.0AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
28 Jun 199167.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199167.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli
9 Jun 200581.3RetiredBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
24 Oct 201591.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Chryzostom Korec
Ján Chryzostom Cardinal Korec S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBošany, Diocese of Nitra
Ordained Bishop(in secret), Czechoslovakia

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 64.1 years
  • a cardinal for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 80
  • c1: CB, 11 Jan 2014
  • d: CB, 24 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,418
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,674
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Apr 2021

Quantcast