Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustine Kasujja

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Belgium

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1946 Born
6 Jan 197326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
26 May 199852.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Numidia
26 May 199852.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Algeria
26 May 199852.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tunisia
22 Aug 199852.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Numidia
22 Apr 200457.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Madagascar
22 Apr 200457.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Seychelles
22 Apr 200457.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Comoros
9 Jun 200458.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mauritius
2 Feb 201063.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nigeria
12 Oct 201670.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
7 Dec 201670.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg
31 Aug 202175.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
31 Aug 202175.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Augustine Kasujja (VIAF: 16230278)
Archbishop Augustine Kasujja (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Belgium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMitala-Maria, Uganda
Ordained BishopRubaga, Cathedral, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala, Uganda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Belgium.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,372
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast