Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Jop

Deceased

Bishop of Opole, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1897Born
29 Aug 192022.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 194548.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
24 Oct 194548.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
19 May 194648.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
25 May 196769.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
28 Jun 197274.7AppointedBishop of Opole, Poland
24 Sep 197678.9DiedBishop of Opole, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Jop
Bishop Franciszek Jop (born , died ) Bishop of Opole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlupia Stara
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Sandomierz, Diocese of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/bish/opol: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 515
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 37
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 621, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 694

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast