Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Toshio Jinushi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sapporo, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1930Born
20 Mar 196029.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sapporo, Japan
3 Oct 198757.0AppointedBishop of Sapporo, Japan
15 Jan 198857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sapporo, Japan
17 Nov 200979.1RetiredBishop of Sapporo, Japan
4 May 202190.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sapporo, Japan

MicroData Summary for Peter Toshio Jinushi
Bishop Peter Toshio Jinushi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sapporo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHokkaido
Ordained BishopSapporo, Diocese of Sapporo
Death PlaceSapporo Health, Hospital, Sapporo, Diocese of Sapporo

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,550
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 4 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast