Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Milad Jawish, B.S.

Bishop-Elect of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1973 Born
14 Aug 199218.6EnteredMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
21 Aug 199319.6Temporary VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
10 Oct 199925.8Solemn VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
20 Nov 199925.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
6 May 200026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
18 Sep 202147.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
30 Oct 202147.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada

MicroData Summary for Milad Jawish
Father Milad Jawish B.S. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMansoura, Diocese of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Please contact the Father through the Eparchy of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2021
  • od/c01/temp: CB, 18 Sep 2021
  • ob: CB, 29 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast