Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Gilbert Hess, O.S.B. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Swiss-American Congregation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1908Born
6 Aug 192719.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 May 193224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1960²51.9AppointedPresident of Order of Saint Benedict
1965²56.9ResignedPresident of Order of Saint Benedict
15 May 199587.3DiedPresident Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Hess
Abbot Gilbert Hess O.S.B. (born , died ) President Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVincennes, IN, USA
Death PlaceSt. Bernard of Providence, Hospital, Milbank, SD

  • a priest for 62.9 years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 29 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast