Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bede Vincent Heather

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parramatta, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1928Born
15 Jul 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
30 Jun 197950.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
30 Jun 197950.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
4 Aug 197950.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obbi
8 Apr 198657.3AppointedBishop of Parramatta, Australia
18 May 198657.4InstalledBishop of Parramatta, Australia
10 Jul 199768.5ResignedBishop of Parramatta, Australia
25 Feb 202192.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Parramatta, Australia

MicroData Summary for Bede Vincent Heather
Bishop Bede Vincent Heather (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parramatta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrathfield
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney
Death PlaceSaint Ezekiel Moreno Nursing Home, Croydon

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,425
  • d: CB, 25 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast