Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Han Jingtao (Han Qian)

Deceased

Bishop of Siping [Szepingkai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1921Born
14 Dec 194726.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 198260.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Siping [Szepingkai], China
1986²64.4SucceededBishop of Siping [Szepingkai], China
31 Dec 202099.4DiedBishop of Siping [Szepingkai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Han Jingtao (Han Qian)
Bishop Andreas Han Jingtao (Han Qian) (born , died ) Bishop of Siping [Szepingkai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanwanzi, Weichang County, Hebei

  • a priest for 73.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 14
  • d: CB, 31 Dec 2020
  • d/ob/c2: CB, 1 Jan 2021
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,521, Necrology (back)
  • b: CB, 23 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast