Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Lester Guilly, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1905Born
6 Sep 193833.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Jul 195449.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
18 Jul 195449.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
24 Oct 195449.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
29 Feb 195650.6AppointedBishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
12 Aug 197267.0ResignedBishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
7 Jun 199690.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Richard Lester Guilly
Bishop Richard Lester Guilly S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Georgetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Georgtown, Vicariate Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob.loc: CB, 1 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast