Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pietro Guerra

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1267AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
2 Aug 1278AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
1286²AppointedAdministrator of Sora, Italy
20 Aug 1286AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
1295²ResignedAdministrator of Sora, Italy
6 Jan 1298AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
8 Jul 1299AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
19 Feb 1301DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Guerra
Patriarch Pietro Guerra (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 165, and Page 99
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 348, and Page 416
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast