Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Gómez Rivera

Auxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

Titular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1963 Born
27 Jan 199632.7Ordained PriestPriest of Choluteca, Honduras
14 Nov 202057.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
14 Nov 202057.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
15 May 202158.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Gómez Rivera
Bishop Teodoro Gómez Rivera (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Banquito, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Suyapa, Basilica, Tegucigalpa, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 5 May 2021
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 May 2021

Quantcast