Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jesús González de Zárate Salas

Archbishop of Valencia en Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1960 Born
11 Jan 198625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 Oct 200746.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 Oct 200746.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Suava
12 Jan 200847.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suava
24 May 201857.4AppointedArchbishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
5 Aug 201857.6InstalledArchbishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
28 Jun 202463.5AppointedArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela
21 Sep 202463.7InstalledArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Jesús González de Zárate Salas
(WikiData: Q1688424)
Archbishop Jesús González de Zárate Salas (born ) Archbishop of Valencia en Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCumaná, Diocese of Cumaná
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,594
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2024
  • i: CB, 10 Jul 2024
  • i: CB, 16 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 16 Jul 2024